+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek
+ − Statutes Amended (28)
- 35 ILCS 200/18-185 -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-101 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-101
- 40 ILCS 5/3-101.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-101.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/7-199.5 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-102.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-103 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-103
- 40 ILCS 5/3-103.9 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-104 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-105 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-105
- 40 ILCS 5/3-108.2 -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-108.3 -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-110
- 40 ILCS 5/3-110.7 -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-125 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-125
- 40 ILCS 5/3-125.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-125.1
- 40 ILCS 5/3-128 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-128
- 40 ILCS 5/3-128.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-128.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-134 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-134
- 40 ILCS 5/3-135 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-135
- 40 ILCS 5/3-140.5 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-141 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-141
- 40 ILCS 5/3-141a new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-141b new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-141c new -
- 40 ILCS 5/3-141d new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.43 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor