+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0151
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 10, 2003
On June 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Susana Mendoza
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2003
- Second Reading
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2003
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2004, no new applicant and, on the date of licensure renewal, no current licensee may operate or receive a license from the Department to operate, no person may be employed by, and no adult person may reside in a child care facility who has been convicted of committing or attempting to commit specified offenses. Provides circumstances under which such a license may be issued despite such a conviction. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 10/4.2 - from Ch. 23, par. 2214.2
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: SB0110 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 6, 2003: SB0110 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 06, 2003
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor