+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-018-001
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 5, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Executive; 011-005-000
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 5/704A -
- 820 ILCS 105/4 - from Ch. 48, par. 1004
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2015: SB0011 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 05, 2015
February 4, 2015: SB0011 - Executive - Feb 04, 2015
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor