+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0494
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 28, 2007
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 006-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 31, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Bond
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Commerce and Economic Development
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bond
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Authorizes the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to conduct a study regarding the creation of advanced sciences zones and other policy proposals to encourage the creation of technology jobs in the State. Provides that a copy of the study report must be made available to members of the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2008. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Authorizes the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to conduct a study regarding the creation of advanced sciences zones and other policy proposals to encourage the creation of technology jobs in the State. Provides that a copy of the study report must be made available to members of the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2008. Effective immediately.