+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Sen. Louis S. Viverito; , Cullerton, Hendon, Petka and Roskam, Motion to Re-refer, pursuant to Senate Rule 3-7. Re-referred to the Senate Rules Committee.
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass Commerce & Economic Development; 007-002-000
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce & Economic Development
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce & Economic Development
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce & Economic Development
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-1 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor