+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0160
- Effective Date July 26, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Public Health
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Further amends the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act. Provides that a facility that houses dementia residents may allow electronic monitoring devices only in rooms that are located in a building that is entirely dedicated to dementia care or that are located in a building that is solely dedicated to dementia care. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2019: SB0109 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: SB0109 - Human Services
March 27, 2019: SB0109 - Third Reading
March 12, 2019: SB0109 - Public Health
March 12, 2019: SCA0001 - Public Health
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor