+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 23, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0159
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Assigned to Executive
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act to provide that the Plan shall discontinue as the alternative market for health insurance for certain Illinois residents and discontinue as the alternative mechanism not later than January 1, 2022. Provides that not later than 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board shall develop a plan of rehabilitation or liquidation and dissolution to wind down the affairs of the Plan. Provides that upon the Director of Insurance's approval of the plan of rehabilitation or liquidation and dissolution, the Director shall thereafter report to the Attorney General, whose duty it shall be to file a complaint for rehabilitation or liquidation of the Plan. Provides that upon entry of a final Order of Rehabilitation or Liquidation and the appointment of the Director as statutory rehabilitator or liquidator, the Director shall begin to administer and oversee the wind-down and dissolution of the Plan. Provides that new enrollment and policy renewals in the Plan are discontinued on December 31, 2021. Sets forth provisions concerning cessation of operations of the Plan. Amends the Department of Insurance Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, upon entry of an Order of Rehabilitation or Liquidation against the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan, all powers, duties, rights, and responsibilities of the Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan and the Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board under the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act shall be transferred to and vested in the Director of Insurance as rehabilitator or liquidator. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 210 ILCS 9/5
- 20 ILCS 1405/1405-40 new
- 215 ILCS 105/1.1 - from Ch. 73, par. 1301.1
- 215 ILCS 105/3 - from Ch. 73, par. 1303
- 215 ILCS 105/15
- 215 ILCS 105/16 new
- 215 ILCS 105/17 new