+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On October 27, 2017 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Althoff
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On October 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno