+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0530
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale A. Righter
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 008-000-003
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall specify that a diabetes screening as defined by rule shall be included as a required part of each health examination, but that diabetes testing is not required. Effective January 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-8.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-8.1
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2003: SB1081 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 21, 2003
April 4, 2003: SB1081 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2003
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor