+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0381
- Effective Date July 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Adopted Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Health & Human Services
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Children & Family Services
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 007-000-000
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale E. Risinger
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes references to child care facilities to licensed day care facilities.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2003: SB1079 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 14, 2003
April 4, 2003: SB1079 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2003
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor