+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0375
- Effective Date August 17, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4 - May 26, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2015
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 004
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that the term "accessibility improvement" means a home modification listed under the Home Services Program administered by the Department of Human Services, including, but not limited to the installation of ramps and grab-bars, widening door-ways, and other changes to enhance the independence of a disabled or elderly individual (in the engrossed bill, "accessibility improvement" is defined as a modification or addition to residential property that is designed to make the property more accessible to a disabled person, including, but not limited to, the installation of ramps, lifts, or fixtures, or the removal of architectural barriers on the property). Limits the period of time during which accessibility improvements will not increase the assessed valuation of property to 7 years after the improvements are completed. Further amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the disabled veterans standard homestead exemption, provides that, for taxable years 2015 and thereafter: (i) if the veteran has a service connected disability of 30% or more but less than 50%, the annual exemption is $2,500; (ii) if the veteran has a service connected disability of 50% or more but less than 70%, the annual exemption is $5,000; and (iii) if the veteran has a service connected disability of 70% or more, then the property is exempt from taxation. Effective immediately.