+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 25, 2015: SB1069 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor