+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jim Oberweis
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: SFA0001 - State Government
March 6, 2019: SB1061 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor