+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On July 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-012-001
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 012-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the definition of "employee" includes persons who otherwise meet that definition but are ineligible to participate in the State Universities Retirement System because they received a distribution of vested amounts under the self-managed plan established in the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code while eligible to retire under that System. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5 ILCS 340/1 - from Ch. 15, par. 501
- 5 ILCS 375/3 - from Ch. 127, par. 523
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2016: SB1059 - Third Reading
May 25, 2016: SB1059 - Executive
May 12, 2016: SB1059 - Third Reading
May 11, 2016: SFA0001 - Insurance
March 25, 2015: SB1059 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor