+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0554
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2013
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-001-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 012-000-004
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended Energy; 011-001-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- Assigned to Energy
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Provides that an electric utility providing Market Settlement Service shall be permitted to recover its reasonable and prudent initial implementation and start-up costs from retail consumers having maximum demands exceeding 400 kilowatts through its delivery service charges.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an electric utility shall be permitted to provide Market Settlement Service. Provides that Market Settlement Service shall apply to the difference between (i) the actual quantities of electric power and energy supply provided to any such retail customer during a given period and (ii) the quantities of such supply that were deemed to have been provided to such retail customer for the purposes of the applicable regional transmission organization's final wholesale market settlements during that same period. Provides that an electric utility providing Market Settlement Service shall be permitted to recover all of its reasonable and prudently incurred administrative and operational costs of providing this service from all of its retail customers through its delivery services charges. Provides that Market Settlement Service shall be provided pursuant to a tariff of the electric utility on file with the Illinois Commerce Commission. Provides that an electric utility that has a tariff in effect shall not be subject to, or allowed to pursue, any other claims, adjustments, settlements, or offsets related to the cost of any difference in the actual quantities of electric energy, capacity, transmission services, or other services included in Market Settlement Service, provided, however, that the provisions (i) preclude any subsequent and separate adjustments made to the same retail customer's electric service account or (ii) reduce or impair in any way an electric utility's authority to charge a retail customer for unmetered electric service related to the retail customer's unlawful tampering with or interference with electric service. Provides that the Commission shall review and by order approve, or approve as modified, the proposed tariff within 180 days after the date on which it is filed. Provides that an electric utility providing Market Settlement Service shall not be liable to any retail customer, alternative retail electric supplier, or electric utility operating outside of its service territory for any adjustment in the quantity of any transmission or retail electric supply service for which the applicable regional transmission organization under its tariffs, agreements, and market and business rules will no longer make a corresponding adjustment to the wholesale market settlements.