+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Contains a statement of intent and purpose. Reenacts provisions of the Criminal Code of 1961 regarding armed robbery. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/100-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 100-1