+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0524
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 013-006-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-014-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sandoval
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-003-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, and provides that when a contractor receives any payment, the contractor shall pay each subcontractor and material supplier electronically within 10 business days or 15 calendar days, whichever occurs earlier (as engrossed, payment required within 7 business days), or, if paid by a printed check, the printed check must be postmarked within 10 business days or 15 calendar days, whichever occurs earlier (as engrossed, postmark required within 7 business days), after receiving payment. Makes conforming changes.
Senate Amendment 003
Requires the Department of Transportation to publish on its website a searchable database that allows for queries for each active construction contract by the name of a subcontractor or the pay item such that each pay item is associated with either the prime contractor or a subcontractor (currently, queries for each active construction contract not required).
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Provides that on and after July 1, 2021, "a proper bill or invoice" also includes the names of all subcontractors or subconsultants to be paid from the bill or invoice and the amounts due to each of them, if any. Requires contractors to pay each subcontractor and material supplier, either electronically, within 7 business days after receiving payment, or if paid by a printed check, the printed check must be postmarked within 7 business days after receiving payment. Requires contractors to provide written notice of refusal to pay a subcontractor or material supplier within 7 business days after receiving payment. Provides a penalty for a contractor's failure to provide payment to a subcontractor or material supplier within 7 business days after receiving payment. Provides that on or before July 2021, the Department of Transportation shall publish on its website a searchable database that allows for queries by the name of a subcontractor or the pay item such that each pay item is associated with either the prime contractor or a subcontractor. Makes conforming changes.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Modifies the term "a proper bill or invoice" to include the names of all subcontractors or subconsultants to be paid from the bill or invoice and the amounts due to each of them, if any. Requires contractors to pay each subcontractor and material supplier within 7 business days after receiving payment. Requires contractors to provide written notice of refusal to pay a subcontractor or material supplier electronically within 7 business days after receiving payment. Provides a penalty for a contractor's failure to provide payment to a subcontractor or material supplier electronically within 7 business days after receiving payment. Provides that on or before July 2021, the Department of Transportation shall publish on its website a searchable database that allows for queries by the name of a subcontractor or the pay item of each pay period such that each pay item is associated with either the prime contractor or a subcontractor. Makes conforming changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 30 ILCS 500/20-120 -
- 30 ILCS 540/7 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.407
- 30 ILCS 540/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.401