+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor