+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Sent to the Governor
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 2, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0008
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-001-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-006-001
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Tourism and Hospitality; 007-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Tourism and Hospitality
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Tourism and Hospitality
- Assigned to Tourism and Hospitality
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Provides for repeal of provisions concerning delivery and carry out of mixed drinks on January 3, 2024 (rather than January 1, 2025). Further amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that, from June 10, 2021 through July 10, 2021, a retail licensee may offer a single drink of alcoholic liquor at no cost to a customer as part of a publicly advertised promotion to encourage participation in any COVID-19 vaccination program if the customer provides proof of COVID-19 vaccination received at any time. Provides that drinks may be provided only from 6 p.m. through 10 p.m. Provides that a retail licensee's participation in providing a single drink of alcoholic liquor is voluntary. Allows the retail licensee to determine or restrict which single drink of alcoholic liquor it will provide at no cost but provides that under no circumstances may a single drink of alcoholic liquor exceed 1.5 ounces of distilled spirits, 5 ounces of wine, or 12 ounces of beer. Allows a local liquor control commissioner or local liquor control commission to prohibit retail licensees within its jurisdiction from providing a single drink of alcoholic liquor at no charge by promulgating a rule or policy preempting this Section. Provides that, after receiving a single drink of alcoholic liquor at no charge, no customer shall receive a subsequent drink from the retail licensee providing the drink at no charge or from another retail licensee on the same day or any subsequent day. Requires the retail licensee to develop procedures to verify the identity of the vaccinated customer by comparing the vaccination card to a form of valid federal or State identification. Provides that the retail licensee shall develop procedures to ensure that a customer does not obtain more than a single drink at no charge and the retail licensee shall be subject to penalties imposed by the State Commission if the retail licensee provides more than a single drink to a particular customer at no charge. Provides that the Illinois Liquor Control Commission may publish further guidelines on the implementation of this Section not inconsistent with this Section and shall post them on the State Commission's website. Provides for repeal of the provisions on July 11, 2021. Makes other changes.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. In the Liquor Control Act of 1934, adds to the definition of "original container" a container that is filled and labeled by the manufacturer and secured by the manufacturer's original unbroken seal. Provides that "sealed container" includes a manufacturer's original container. Provides that a manufacturer's original container shall be affixed with a label or tag that contains the name, license number, and address of the retail licensee that sold the product. Provides for repeal of provisions concerning delivery and carry out of mixed drinks on January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2024). Removes provisions amending the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Removes provisions from the introduced bill allowing manufacturers, non-resident dealers, foreign importers, distributors, or importing distributors to make certain donations related to COVID-19.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 235 ILCS 5/6-5 - from Ch. 43, par. 122
- 235 ILCS 5/6-6.65 new
- 235 ILCS 5/6-28.8
- 35 ILCS 105/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.9
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
- 235 ILCS 5/6-37 new