+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Connelly
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly; -Rose
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 740 ILCS 10/1 - from Ch. 38, par. 60-1
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: SB1021 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor