+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0661
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date February 10, 2004
On December 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000
On November 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Education
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On November 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001
On November 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 18, 2003
On November 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-001
On November 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William J. Grunloh
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William J. Grunloh
On October 30, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
On October 28, 2003 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides for the voluntary registration and recognition of non-public elementary and secondary schools in Illinois. Requires assurances of compliance with State and federal laws. Provides for the State Board of Education to prescribe guidelines and procedures. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
November 19, 2003: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, November 19, 2003
November 6, 2003: SB1014 - Third Reading - Thursday, November 06, 2003
March 27, 2003: SB1014 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor