+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Effective Date August 24, 2007
- Governor Approved
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0423
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Bond
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bond
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a pilot program from moneys available under which Internet Gang Crime Units shall be created in the Cook County Sheriff's Office, the City of Danville Police Department, and the Village of Round Lake Heights Police Department. Provides for allocation of the moneys available under the pilot program. Provides that the Internet Gang Crime Units shall investigate criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Provides that peace officers in each Internet Gang Crime Unit shall have extra-jurisdictional authority to conduct investigations and make arrests anywhere in the State of Illinois regarding criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Contains provisions concerning seizures, forfeitures, and reports. Provides that the pilot program shall terminate on July 1, 2010. Makes a corresponding change in the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Effective July 1, 2007.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/2-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 2-5