+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 6, 2019: SB1013 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor