+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0074
- Effective Date July 9, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Health; 013-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Medicaid
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a person who uses Medicaid spend-down to qualify for medical assistance shall be provided up to 6 consecutive months to submit and have medical receipts and bills processed by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services as evidence of payment of the person's monthly spend-down amount before becoming ineligible for medical assistance. Effective immediately.