+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor