+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy