+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Veterans Affairs Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Urges the Department of Central Management Services to provide a monthly list of State job openings to the Department of Veterans' Affairs, the Department of Employment Security, and the Department of Military Affairs (instead of urging the Department of Central Management Services and the Department of Employment Security to provide a monthly list of State job openings to the Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Department of Military Affairs).
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor