+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor