+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 046-009-001
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 28, 2014
- Be Adopted Executive; 011-004-000
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland
- Assigned to Executive
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 083-033-000
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2014: HJR0096 - Motion To Adopt - Friday, May 30, 2014
May 21, 2014: HJR0096 - Wednesday, May 21, 2014
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor