+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor