+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 108-000-001
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Vote
April 30, 2013: HR0095 - Tuesday, April 30, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor