+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 111-000-000
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Higher Education Committee; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes the language to provide that the Board of Higher Education shall make recommendations to the General Assembly on the feasibility of a 2-year budgeting cycle by filing a report as provided in Section 3.1 of the General Assembly Organization Act on or before September 1, 2010 (instead of June 30, 2010).