+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor