+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 23, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 018-000-000
On May 30, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor