+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers