+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris