+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Environment & Energy Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor