+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robin Kelly
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor