+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Be Adopted State Government; 008-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to State Government
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 111-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Calvin L. Giles
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Calvin L. Giles
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Adds one member representing the Governor's office and 13 (instead of 8) members representing the public to the Task Force.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Adds one member representing the Governor's office and 13 (instead of 8) members representing the public to the Task Force.
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2006: HJR0087 - Motion To Adopt - Wednesday, May 03, 2006
April 4, 2006: HJR0087 - Tuesday, April 04, 2006
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor