+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Place Calendar Resolutions - Short Debate
- Recommends Be Adopted / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Churchill
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor