+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 10, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes Resolved clause permitting those who served in 173rd Airborne, or family members of those deceased who so served, to request their names be designated along Illinois Route 173.