+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Mental Health Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Vote
April 12, 2018: HR0860 - Mental Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor