+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: HR0085 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor