+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank Aguilar