+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
+ − Vote
April 18, 2018: HR0828 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor