+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor