+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz