+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-000-000
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor