+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eileen Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robin Kelly
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor