+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- To Scholarship Tax Credit Oversight Subcommittee
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor